Mufti, Areej Hassan (CPSO#: 78244)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 07 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 12 Oct 2007
Research Fellows - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 2007 to 08 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2008