Mufti, Perween (CPSO#: 51624)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Shah, Perween (used until: 03 Nov 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2008