Mugford, Johanna Lynn (CPSO#: 66756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Johanna Mugford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mugford ( CPSO# 66756 )

Business Address:
Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone Number: (416) 932-3172

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANNA LYNN MUGFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUGFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 1995