Muggah, Henry Forman (CPSO#: 25224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
79 Hillcrest Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8P 2X1
Phone: (905) 526-0706
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY FORMAN MUGGAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUGGAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1974