Muhsen, Jafaar (CPSO#: 78916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Walk-in Clinic
500 Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 0G2
Phone: (905) 594-1828
Fax: (905)594-1829
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muhsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Muhsen ( CPSO# 78916 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Walk-In Clinic
500 Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 0G2
Phone Number: (905) 594-1828

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAFAAR MUHSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003