Muir, Andrew Butler Scot (CPSO#: 54537)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 1995