Muir, John Douglass (CPSO#: 26676)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Douglass Muir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010