Muirhead, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 32688)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Nov 1987