Muirhead, Norman (CPSO#: 53103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
C/O Department Medicine
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3350
Fax: (519) 663-8808
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman Muirhead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. N. Muirhead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Muirhead ( CPSO# 53103 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
C/O Department Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Health Sciences North Sudbury
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN MUIRHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUIRHEAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985