Mukerji, Geetha (CPSO#: 88542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Subramanian, Geetha (used until: 27 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Endocrinology
3rd Floor
76 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street, 5th Floor
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Fax: (416) 361-2657
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEETHA MUKERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKERJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012