Mukherjee, Chirojit (CPSO#: 83945)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Gulbarga University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 24 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2007