Mukherjee, Shubhra (CPSO#: 69777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
355 East Erie Street
Chicago IL  60611
United States
Phone: (312) 238-2842
Fax: (312) 238-1208

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUBHRA MUKHERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 1996 to 10 Mar 1996
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1999 to 13 Aug 1999
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2001