Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mukherji, Atreyi (CPSO#: 67028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
AVIVA Medical Diagnostic and
Specialty Clinic
SouthMount Medical Center
35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Hamilton ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3303
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATREYI MUKHERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1997