Mukhida, Karim (CPSO#: 76671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dalhousie University
Queen Elizabeth II HSC
Department of Anaesthesia
1799 Robie Street
Halifax NS  B3H 3G1
Phone: (902) 473-4130

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIM MUKHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHIDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 04 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017