Mukhtar, Mariam Saud H (CPSO#: 105566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 13 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
190 Elizabeth Street
R Fraser Elliot Building 35 805
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 978-7230
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM SAUD H MUKHTAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MUKHTAR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MUKHTAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MUKHTAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MUKHTAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MUKHTAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MUKHTAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2015 to 12 Jun 2015
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018