Mulasi, Ila (CPSO#: 70720)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Apr 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 1996 to 21 Jul 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 1997