Mulcaster, Julian Thomas (CPSO#: 73720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences
Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
McMaster University Medical Center
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905 521-2100 Ext. 44621
Fax: 905 577-8022
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mulcaster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mulcaster ( CPSO# 73720 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Henderson General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN THOMAS MULCASTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULCASTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1999