Muldoon, Laura Kathleen (CPSO#: 58531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Rosemount Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1P4
Phone: (613) 688-1177
Fax: (613) 688-1991
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA KATHLEEN MULDOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULDOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987