Muldowney, Siobhan Mary (CPSO#: 68702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1995

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
91 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5L3
Phone: (613) 283-0710
Fax: (613) 283-9730
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siobhan M. Muldowney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Muldowney ( CPSO# 68702 )

Business Address:
91 Cornelia Street
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5L3
Phone Number: (613) 283-0710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIOBHAN MARY MULDOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULDOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1995

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)