Mulholland, Robert Stephen (CPSO#: 59297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Phone: (416) 922-2868
Fax: (416) 922-2351
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STEPHEN MULHOLLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULHOLLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 May 1988 to 12 Jun 1988
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989