Mulji, Amin Shaukatali (CPSO#: 51136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 501
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4
Phone: (905) 529-0793
Fax: (905) 527-4861
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Mulji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mulji ( CPSO# 51136 )

Business Address:
Suite 501
304 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G4
Phone Number: (905) 529-0793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIN SHAUKATALI MULJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1985

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Amin MULJI on or about August 20, 2017, at the City of Toronto did, by word of mouth, knowingly utter a threat to cause death, bodily harm to XX, contrary to Section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: February 27, 2018
Place of charge: Toronto, ON
Toronto Police Service


Source: Member
Active Date: March 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Amin Shaukatali Mulji:

(1) on or about September 24, 2017 (two counts) at the City of Hamilton did by verbal means knowingly utter a threat to XX to cause death to the victim, contrary to the provisions of Section 264.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(2) on or about April 15, 2017 at the City of Hamilton did by verbal means knowingly utter a threat to XX to cause death to XX, contrary to Section 264.1(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada;

(3) on or about July 8, 2014 at the City of Hamilton did, in committing an assault, cause bodily harm upon XX, contrary to the provisions of Section 267(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(4) on or about June 29, 2007 at the City of Hamilton did unlawfully commit an assault upon XX, contrary to the provisions of Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: February 18, 2018 and February 27, 2018
Place of charge: Hamilton, ON
Hamilton Police Service