Mullen, John Charles (CPSO#: 52511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Alberta
2D2.18 Walter Mackenzie
Health Science Centre
8440 - 112 Street
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-6327
Fax: (780) 407-6752
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1049 Fogo Street
Bala ON  P0C 1A0
Canada
Phone: (705) 300-1215
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1985