Mulligan, John Michael (CPSO#: 61038)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1997