Mulligan, Stephane (CPSO#: 55826)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994