Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mulliken, Brian David (CPSO#: 67515)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994