Mullin, James Gordon (CPSO#: 25664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1973

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
315 Stewart Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 6K5
Phone: (613) 789-8282
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Apr 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES GORDON MULLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On August 16, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required psychiatry physician, Dr. James Gordon Mullin, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Mullin to:

Attend and provide proof of attendance at the Psychopharmacology 2016 conference or equivalent acceptable to the College;

Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the next available course acceptable to the College on medical record-keeping;

Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.