Mulpuru, Sunita Sheila (CPSO#: 84336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road, PO Box 211
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72772
Fax: (613) 737-8319
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Mulpuru Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mulpuru ( CPSO# 84336 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
PO Box 211
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (513) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 05 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNITA SHEILA MULPURU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULPURU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010