Mulroy, Liam Andrew (CPSO#: 60178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nova Scotia Cancer Centre
5820 University Avenue
Halifax NS  B3H 1V7
Phone: (902) 473-6096
Fax: (902) 473-7205

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIAM ANDREW MULROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988