Mulvagh, Sharon Lee (CPSO#: 50031)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1990