Mumtaz, Munawar Pervaiz (CPSO#: 54248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNAWAR PERVAIZ MUMTAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMTAZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2005