Muncey, Nancy Dawn (CPSO#: 22160)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2007