Mundle, William Robert (CPSO#: 71028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Maternal Fetal Medicine Clinic
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52231
Fax: (519) 256-6127
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.R. Mundle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mundle ( CPSO# 71028 )

Business Address:
Maternal Fetal Medicine Clinic
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ROBERT MUNDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNDLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999