Mungan, Nils Kerim (CPSO#: 65110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Ophthalmology
University Medical Center
2500 North State Street
Jackson MS  39216
United States
Phone: (601) 984-5020
Fax: (601) 984-6694

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana
USA - Mississippi

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILS KERIM MUNGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993