Mungara, Anil Kumar (CPSO#: 68852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Date Received: 28 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015