Mungara, Ramamohan Rao (CPSO#: 57185)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Rao, Mungara Ramamohan (used until: 20 Jan 1988 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Andhra University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Community Crisis Centre Health records Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital 1086 Ouellette Avenue Windsor, Ontario N9A 1E1
Date Received: 03 May 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010