Muniz Saavedra, Victoria Maria de la Esperanza (CPSO#: 78670)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 25 Nov 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2006