Munk, Paul (CPSO#: 24530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y4
Phone: (416) 483-3105
Fax: (416) 488-3969
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Munk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Munk ( CPSO# 24530 )

Business Address:
202 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 488-8526

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MUNK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1972