Munkley, Franklyn Hazen (CPSO#: 11598)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1946
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1952
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jul 1955
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1995