Munn, Catharine Jane (CPSO#: 69409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University MUSC B101
Student Wellness Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 27717
Fax: (905) 546-1663
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richards ( CPSO# 68941 )
Dr. C. Munn ( CPSO# 69409 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0721

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHARINE JANE MUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2001