Munn, Robert Ian (CPSO#: 53857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 225-1512
Fax: (416) 225-3728
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 28 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN MUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1992