Munnings, Donald Brian (CPSO#: 31675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD BRIAN MUNNINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNNINGS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1980