Munoz Gonzalez, Juan Eugenio (CPSO#: 57697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Granada, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
62 Norma Crescent
Ancaster ON  L9G 4P2
Phone: (905) 304-8817
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juan E. Munoz Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Munoz Gonzalez ( CPSO# 57697 )

Business Address:
62 Norma Crescent
Ancaster ON  L9G 4P2
Phone Number: (905) 304-8817

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUAN EUGENIO MUNOZ GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNOZ GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1989