Munoz, Washington Patricio (CPSO#: 67436)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 5 Compton Place Hamilton, ON L8T 3X9
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014