Munro, Alistair (CPSO#: 29609)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1997