Munro, Shane Matthew (CPSO#: 65800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
139 Greenbank Road
Suite 102
Nepean ON  K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 829-2031
Fax: (613) 829-2274
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Munro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2013


Corporation Name: Shane Munro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munro ( CPSO# 65800 )

Business Address:
102 - 139 Greenbank Road
Nepean ON  K2H 9A5
Phone Number: (613) 829-2031

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANE MATTHEW MUNRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992