Munshi, Tariq Allauddin (CPSO#: 90302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Mar 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Clinical Services
Department of Psychiatry
385 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1B9
Phone: (613) 544-1356
Fax: (613) 544-2162
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2323
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Canada
Phone: 1-613-5461101 Ext. 5857
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tariq Munshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi ( CPSO# 90302 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Frontenac Clinical Services
Department of Psychiatry
385 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1B9
Phone Number: (613) 544-1356

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi ( CPSO# 90302 )
Dr. S. Hashmatullah ( CPSO# 102007)

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
P.O. Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Frontenac Clinical Services
Department of Psychiatry
385 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1B9
Phone Number: (613) 544-1356

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Mar 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Tariq Allauddin Munshi may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.