Munt, Bradley Ian (CPSO#: 57316)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993