Murat, Brian Wellington (CPSO#: 55656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 206
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-3900
Fax: (705) 787-1808
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.W. Murat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Murat ( CPSO# 55656 )

Business Address:
206 - 348 Muskoka Drive
#3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-3900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN WELLINGTON MURAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1986