Murchison, Sylvia Amelia (CPSO#: 75088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 233
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-2566
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvia Murchison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murchison ( CPSO# 75088 )

Business Address:
233 - 355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA AMELIA MURCHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURCHISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003