Murdison, Kenneth Alexander (CPSO#: 54103)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1995